UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, DC 20549
FORM N-PX
ANNUAL REPORT OF PROXY VOTING RECORD OF REGISTERED
MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT COMPANY
Investment Company Act File Number: 811-07988
Lord Abbett Investment Trust
(Exact name of registrant as specified in charter)
90 Hudson Street, Jersey City, NJ 07302
(Address of principal executive offices) (Zip code)
Christina T. Simmons, Vice President & Assistant Secretary
90 Hudson Street, Jersey City, NJ 07302
(Name and address of agent for service)
Registrant’s telephone number, including area code: (800) 201-6984
Date of fiscal year end: 11/30
Date of reporting period: July 1, 2004 through June 30, 2005
Item 1. Proxy Voting Record.
FORM N-PX REPORT
ICA File Number: 811-07988
Reporting Period: 07/01/2004 - 06/30/2005
Lord Abbett Investment Trust
LORD ABBETT BALANCED FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT CONVERTIBLE FUND
CENDANT CORPORATION
Ticker: | CD | Security ID: | 151313103 |
Meeting Date: | APR 26, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 28, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director Myra J. Biblowit | For | Withhold | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Leonard S. Coleman | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director Cheryl D. Mills | For | For | Management |
1.4 | Elect Director Brian Mulroney | For | For | Management |
1.5 | Elect Director Robert E. Nederlander | For | For | Management |
1.6 | Elect Director Ronald L. Nelson | For | For | Management |
1.7 | Elect Director Robert W. Pittman | For | For | Management |
1.8 | Elect Director Pauline D. E. Richards | For | For | Management |
1.9 | Elect Director Sheli Z. Rosenburg | For | Withhold | Management |
1.10 | Elect Director Robert F. Smith | For | Withhold | Management |
2 | Ratify Auditors | For | For | Management |
3 | Approve Outside Director Stock Awards/Options in Lieu of Cash | For | For | Management |
4 | Approve Qualified Employee Stock Purchase Plan | For | For | Management |
5 | Report on Pay Disparity | Against | Against | Shareholder |
6 | Eliminate or Restrict Severance Agreements (Change-in-Control) | Against | For | Shareholder |
1
CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC.
Ticker: | CAL | Security ID: | 210795308 |
Meeting Date: | JUN 16, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | APR 21, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director Thomas J. Barrack, Jr. | For | For | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Kirbyjon H. Caldwell | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director Lawrence W. Kellner | For | For | Management |
1.4 | Elect Director Douglas H. McCorkindale | For | For | Management |
1.5 | Elect Director Henry L. Meyer, III | For | For | Management |
1.6 | Elect Director Oscar Munoz | For | For | Management |
1.7 | Elect Director George G.C. Parker | For | For | Management |
1.8 | Elect Director Jeffery A. Smisek | For | For | Management |
1.9 | Elect Director Karen Hastie Williams | For | For | Management |
1.10 | Elect Director Ronald B. Woodard | For | For | Management |
1.11 | Elect Director Charles A. Yamarone | For | For | Management |
2 | Amend Omnibus Stock Plan | For | For | Management |
3 | Ratify Auditors | For | For | Management |
4 | Other Business | For | For | Management |
EYETECH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Ticker: | EYET | Security ID: | 302297106 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 11, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 10, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director Phillip M. Satow | For | For | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Samir Patel | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director Michael J. Regan | For | For | Management |
1.4 | Elect Director Damion E. Wicker | For | For | Management |
2 | Ratify Auditors | For | For | Management |
FOOT LOCKER INC
Ticker: | FL | Security ID: | 344849104 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 25, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | APR 1, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director Purdy Crawford | For | For | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Nicholas DiPaolo | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director Philip H. Geier Jr. | For | For | Management |
1.4 | Elect Director Alan D. Feldman | For | For | Management |
2 | Ratify Auditors | For | For | Management |
PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP.
Ticker: | PNCL | Security ID: | 723443107 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 12, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 28, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director James E. McGehee, Jr. | For | For | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Philip H. Trenary | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director Robert A. Peiser | For | For | Management |
2
VALERO ENERGY CORP.
Ticker: | VLO | Security ID: | 91913Y407 |
Meeting Date: | APR 28, 2005 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 1, 2005 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1.1 | Elect Director W.E. Bill Bradford | For | For | Management |
1.2 | Elect Director Ronald K. Calgaard | For | For | Management |
1.3 | Elect Director William E. Greehey | For | For | Management |
2 | Ratify Auditors | For | For | Management |
3 | Approve Omnibus Stock Plan | For | For | Management |
VALERO ENERGY CORP.
Ticker: | VLO | Security ID: | 91913Y407 |
Meeting Date: | SEP 13, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Special |
Record Date: | JUL 27, 2004 |
|
|
# | Proposal | Mgt Rec | Vote Cast | Sponsor |
1 | Increase Authorized Common Stock | For | For | Management |
LORD ABBETT CORE FIXED INCOME FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT HIGH-YIELD FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT INCOME STRATEGY FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT LIMITED DURATION U.S. GOVERNMENT & GOVERNMENT
SPONSORED ENTERPRISES FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT TOTAL RETURN FUND
Nothing to Report
LORD ABBETT U.S. GOVERNMENT & GOVERNMENT SPONSORED
ENTERPRISES FUND
Nothing to Report
3
LORD ABBETT WORLD GROWTH & INCOME STRATEGY FUND
Nothing to Report
END NPX REPORT
4
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Investment Company Act of 1940, the Registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized.
| LORD ABBETT INVESTMENT TRUST | ||
|
| ||
|
| ||
| By: | /s/ Christina T. Simmons |
|
|
| Christina T. Simmons | |
|
| Vice President & Assistant Secretary | |
|
| ||
Date: August 29, 2005 |
|