- Track your favorite companies
- Receive email alerts for new filings
- Personalized dashboard of news and more
- Access all data and search results
Content analysis
?Positive | ||
Negative | ||
Uncertain | ||
Constraining | ||
Legalese | ||
Litigous | ||
Readability |
8th grade Avg
|
- 10-K Annual report
- 4.10 Agreement to Furnish Instruments and Agreements Defining Rights of Holders
- 10.48 Amendment No. 14 to Receivables Purchase Agreement
- 10.58 Summary of Annual Base Salaries Approved for Named Executive Officers of WOR
- 10.62 Summary of Awards, Options and Shares Granted In Fiscal 2014 for Officers
- 21 Subsidiaries of Worthington Industries, Inc.
- 23.1 Consent of Independent Registered Public Accounting Firm (KPMG LLP)
- 23.2 Consent of Independent Auditor (KPMG LLP)
- 24 Powers of Attorney
- 31.1 Section 302 CEO Certification
- 31.2 Section 302 CFO Certification
- 32.1 Section 906 CEO Certification
- 32.2 Section 906 CFO Certification
- 99.1 Worthington Armstrong Venture Consolidated Financial Statements
Exhibit 10.58
ANNUAL BASE SALARIES APPROVED FOR NAMED EXECUTIVE OFFICERS
OF
WORTHINGTON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Effective June 28, 2013, the Compensation and Stock Option Committee of the Board of Directors of Worthington Industries, Inc. (the “Registrant”) approved the base salaries for the named executive officers identified below, which base salaries will become effective September 2013.
Name and Principal Position | Base Salary | |||
John P. McConnell Chairman of the Board and Chief Executive Officer of the Registrant | $ | 625,000 | ||
Mark A. Russell President and Chief Operating Officer of the Registrant | $ | 515,000 | ||
B. Andrew Rose Vice President and Chief Financial Officer of the Registrant | $ | 464,000 | ||
Virgil L. Winland Executive Vice President – Manufacturing of the Registrant | $ | 334,000 | ||
Andrew J. Billman President, Worthington Cylinder Corporation | $ | 390,000 |
George P. Stoe, the other named executive officer of the Registrant for purposes of the Annual Report on Form 10-K for the fiscal year ended May 31, 2013, retired as President and Chief Operating Officer of the Registrant effective August 1, 2012, but remained employed as non-executive chairman of the Engineered Cabs business unit. He retired from that position effective May 31, 2013, but remains employed by the Registrant as an advisor. He will receive a $5,000 per month base salary during the fiscal year ending May 31, 2014.