UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Washington, D.C. 20549
FORM 8-K
CURRENT REPORT
Pursuant to Section 13 or 15(d) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934
Date of Report (Date of earliest event reported) | June 1, 2008 |
La Cortez Energy, Inc. | |
(Exact name of registrant as specified in its charter) |
Nevada | 333-138465 | 20-5157768 | ||
(State or other jurisdiction | (Commission | (IRS Employer | ||
of incorporation) | File Number) | Identification No.) |
1266 1st Street, Suite 4 Sarasota, FL 34236 | |
(Address of principal executive offices) | (Zip Code) |
(941) 365-5081 | |
(Registrant’s telephone number, including area code) |
2260 El Cajon Blvd. #882, San Diego, CA 92104 | |
(Former name or former address, if changed since last report) |
Check the appropriate box below if the Form 8-K filing is intended to simultaneously satisfy the filing obligation of the registrant under any of the following provisions (see General Instruction A.2. below):
o Written communications pursuant to Rule 425 under the Securities Act (17 CFR 230.425)
o Soliciting material pursuant to Rule 14a-12 under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14a-12)
o Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 14d-2(b) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.14d-2(b))
o Pre-commencement communications pursuant to Rule 13e-4(c) under the Exchange Act (17 CFR 240.13e-4(c))
Item 5.02. Departure of Directors or Principal Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Principal Officers.
(b) Effective June 1, 2008, Maria de la Luz, resigned from her positions as Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of La Cortez Energy, Inc. (“we,” “us” or the “Company”) in addition to, and as previously reported on our Form 8-K filed with the Securities and Exchange Commission (the “SEC”) on May 20, 2008 (the “May 20th Form 8-K”), her positions as President and Chief Executive Officer. Ms. de la Luz’s resignation from these positions did not result from any disagreement between her and us.
(c) As previously reported in the May 20th Form 8-K, Andres Gutierrez Rivera became our President and Chief Executive Officer, to fill these positions vacated by Ms. de la Luz, and a member of our Board of Directors, as of June 1, 2008.
Additionally, Nadine Smith, our Vice President, will serve as our Interim Treasurer and Interim Chief Financial Officer, to fill these positions vacated by Ms. de la Luz, and will serve in these capacities until such time as her replacement for these positions is hired.
Nadine Smith has served as our director and Board of Directors Chairperson since February 7, 2008 and our Vice President since February 19, 2008. Ms. Smith has been a private investor and business consultant for more than five years. Ms. Smith was formerly a director of Gran Tierra Energy Inc., a publicly held independent international energy company involved in oil and natural gas exploration and exploitation. Ms. Smith has previously served as a director of Patterson-UTI Energy Inc. and American Retirement Corporation, both public companies. Additionally, during the past ten years, Ms. Smith has served in executive officer capacities for several operating companies. Ms. Smith holds a Bachelor of Science degree in economics from Smith College and a Masters of Business Administration from Yale University. Ms Smith does not have an employment agreement with us and does not receive a salary or any other form of remuneration from us.
1
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
La Cortez Energy, Inc. | ||
| | |
Date: June 4, 2008 | By: | /s/Andres Gutierrez Rivera |
Andres Gutierrez Rivera | ||
2