UNITED STATES
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
WASHINGTON, DC 20549
FORM N-PX
ANNUAL REPORT OF PROXY VOTING RECORD OF REGISTERED
MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT COMPANY
Investment Company Act File Number: 811-02145
LORD ABBETT BOND-DEBENTURE FUND, INC.
(Exact name of registrant as specified in charter)
90 Hudson Street, Jersey City, NJ 07302
(Address of principal executive offices) (Zip code)
Christina T. Simmons, Vice President & Assistant Secretary
90 Hudson Street, Jersey City, NJ 07302
(Name and address of agent for service)
Registrant’s telephone number, including area code: (800) 201-6984
Date of fiscal year end: 12/31
Date of reporting period: July 1, 2003 through June 30, 2004
Item 1. Proxy Voting Record.
Disclose the following information for each matter relating to a portfolio security considered at any shareholder meeting held during the period covered by the report and with respect to which the registrant was entitled to vote:
(a) | The name of the issuer of the portfolio security; |
|
|
(b) | The exchange ticker symbol of the portfolio security; |
|
|
(c) | The Council on Uniform Securities Identification Procedures (“CUSIP”) number for the portfolio security; |
|
|
(d) | The shareholder meeting date; |
|
|
(e) | A brief identification of the matter voted on; |
|
|
(f) | Whether the matter was proposed by the issuer or by a security holder; |
|
|
(g) | Whether the registrant cast its vote on the matter; |
|
|
(h) | How the registrant cast its vote (e.g., for or against proposal, or abstain; for or withhold regarding election of directors); |
|
|
(i) | Whether the registrant cast its vote for or against management. |
FORM N-Px REPORT
ICA File Number: 811-02145
Reporting Period: 07/01/2003 - 06/30/2004
Lord Abbett Bond-Debenture Fund, Inc.
LORD ABBETT BOND-DEBENTURE FUND
3M CO
Ticker: | MMM | Security ID: | 88579Y101 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 11, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 12, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Edward A. Brennan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Michael L. Eskew |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director W. James McNerney, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Kevin W. Sharer |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Increase Authorized Common Stock |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Separate Chairman and CEO Positions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
AIRGATE PCS, INC.
Ticker: | PCSA | Security ID: | 009367301 |
Meeting Date: | APR 8, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 27, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Robert A. Ferchat |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Max D. Hopper |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
ALAMOSA HOLDINGS, INC.
Ticker: | APCS | Security ID: | 011589207 |
Meeting Date: | JUN 2, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | APR 16, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Ray M. Clapp, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director John F. Otto, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Jimmy R. White |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Amend Employee Stock Purchase Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1
APPLE COMPUTER, INC.
Ticker: | AAPL | Security ID: | 037833100 |
Meeting Date: | APR 22, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 24, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director William V. Campbell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Millard S. Drexler |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Albert A. Gore, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Steven P. Jobs |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Arthur D. Levinson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Jerome B. York |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
AUTOMATIC DATA PROCESSING, INC.
Ticker: | ADP | Security ID: | 053015103 |
Meeting Date: | NOV 11, 2003 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | SEP 12, 2003 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Gregory D. Brenneman |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Leslie A. Brun |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Gary C. Butler |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Joseph A. Califano, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Leon G. Cooperman |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Ann Dibble Jordan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Harvey M. Krueger |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Frederic V. Malek |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Henry Taub |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Arthur F. Weinbach |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Josh S. Weston |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Amend Stock Option Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Employee Stock Purchase Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Approve Outside Director Stock Awards in Lieu of Cash |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
BANK OF NEW YORK CO., INC., THE
Ticker: | BK | Security ID: | 064057102 |
Meeting Date: | APR 13, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 23, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Frank J. Biondi, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Nicholas M. Donofrio |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Alan R. Griffith |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Gerald L. Hassell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Richard J. Kogan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Michael J. Kowalski |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director John A. Luke, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director John C. Malone |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Paul Myners, CBE |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Robert C. Pozen |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Catherine A. Rein |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.12 |
| Elect Director Thomas A. Renyi |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.13 |
| Elect Director William C. Richardson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.14 |
| Elect Director Brian L. Roberts |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.15 |
| Elect Director Samuel C. Scott III |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Executive Incentive Bonus Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Report on Political Contributions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6 |
| Limit Composition of Committee to Independent Directors |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7 |
| Submit Shareholder Rights Plan (Poison Pill) to Shareholder Vote |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
2
BEA SYSTEMS, INC.
Ticker: | BEAS | Security ID: | 073325102 |
Meeting Date: | JUN 11, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | APR 30, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Dean O. Morton |
| For |
| Withhold |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director George Reyes |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| Against |
| Management |
|
CHEVRONTEXACO CORP.
Ticker: | CVX | Security ID: | 166764100 |
Meeting Date: | APR 28, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 1, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Samuel H. Armacost |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Robert E. Denham |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Robert J. Eaton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Sam Ginn |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Carla Anderson Hills |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Franklyn G. Jenifer |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director J. Bennett Johnston |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Sam Nunn |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director David J. O’Reilly |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Peter J. Robertson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Charles R. Shoemate |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.12 |
| Elect Director Carl Ware |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Adopt Shareholder Rights Plan (Poison Pill) Policy |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Report on Operational Impact of HIV/AIDS, TB, and Malaria Pandemic |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6 |
| Report on Political Contributions/Activities |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7 |
| Require Affirmative Vote of a Majority of the Shares to Elect Directors |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
8 |
| Report on Health and Environmental Initiatives in Ecuador |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
9 |
| Report on Renewable Energy |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
3
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & CO.
Ticker: | DD | Security ID: | 263534109 |
Meeting Date: | APR 28, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 9, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Alain J. P. Belda |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Richard H. Brown |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Curtis J. Crawford |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director John T. Dillon |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Louisa C. Duemling |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Charles O. Holliday, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Deborah C. Hopkins |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Lois D. Juliber |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Masahisa Naitoh |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director William K. Reilly |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director H. Rodney Sharp, III |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.12 |
| Elect Director Charles M. Vest |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Report on Executive Ties to Government |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
4 |
| Adopt and Report on a Code of Corporate Conduct |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
EMC CORP.
Ticker: | EMC | Security ID: | 268648102 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 5, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 8, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director John R. Egan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Michael C. Ruettgers |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director David N. Strohm |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Employee Stock Purchase Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Ticker: | EMR | Security ID: | 291011104 |
Meeting Date: | FEB 3, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | NOV 24, 2003 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director C. Fernandez G. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director C.F. Knight |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director G.A. Lodge |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director R.L. Ridgway |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director E.E. Whitacre, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Approve Executive Incentive Bonus Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4
EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Ticker: | XOM | Security ID: | 30231G102 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 26, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | APR 5, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Michael J. Boskin |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director James R. Houghton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director William R. Howell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Reatha Clark King |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Philip E. Lippincott |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Harry J. Longwell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Henry A. McKinnell, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Marilyn Carlson Nelson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Lee R. Raymond |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Walter V. Shipley |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Rex W. Tillerson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Approve Non-Employee Director Restricted Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Affirm Political Nonpartisanship |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Report on Political Contributions/Activities |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6 |
| Report on Equatorial Guinea |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7 |
| Separate Chairman and CEO Positions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
8 |
| Prohibit Awards to Executives |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
9 |
| Report on Stock Option Distribution by Race and Gender |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
10 |
| Amend EEO Statement to Include Reference to Sexual Orientation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
11 |
| Report on Climate Change Research |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
HEALTHCARE REALTY TRUST, INC.
Ticker: | HR | Security ID: | 421946104 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 11, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 11, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Marliese E. Mooney |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Edwin B. Morris III |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director John Knox Singleton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5
HUBBELL INCORPORATED
Ticker: | HUB.B | Security ID: | 443510201 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 3, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 5, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director G. Jackson Ratcliffe |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director E. Richard Brooks |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director George Edwards, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Joel Hoffman |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Andrew McNally IV |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Daniel Meyer |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Timothy Powers |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Malcolm Wallop |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Daniel Van Riper |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Richard Swift |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
INTERNATIONAL PAPER CO.
Ticker: | IP | Security ID: | 460146103 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 11, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 17, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Martha F. Brooks |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director James A. Henderson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Robert D. Kennedy |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director W. Craig McClelland |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Robert M. Amen |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
KELLOGG CO.
Ticker: | K | Security ID: | 487836108 |
Meeting Date: | APR 23, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 4, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Gordon Gund |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Dorothy A. Johnson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Ann Mclaughlin Korologos |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Report on Genetically Modified Organisms (GMO) |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6
MCDONALD’S CORP.
Ticker: | MCD | Security ID: | 580135101 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 20, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 22, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Edward A. Brennan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Walter E. Massey |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director John W. Rogers, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Anne-Marie Slaughter |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Roger W. Stone |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Approve/Amend Executive Incentive Bonus Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
MERCK & CO., INC.
Ticker: | MRK | Security ID: | 589331107 |
Meeting Date: | APR 27, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 24, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Peter C. Wendell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director William G. Bowen |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director William M. Daley |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Thomas E. Shenk |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Wendell P. Weeks |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Declassify the Board of Directors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Prohibit Awards to Executives |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Develop Ethical Criteria for Patent Extension |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6 |
| Link Executive Compensation to Social Issues |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7 |
| Report on Political Contributions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
8 |
| Report on Operational Impact of HIV/AIDS, TB, and Malaria Pandemic |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
METLIFE, INC
Ticker: | MET | Security ID: | 59156R108 |
Meeting Date: | APR 27, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 1, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Curtis H. Barnette |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director John C. Danforth |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Burton A. Dole, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Harry P. Kamen |
| For |
| Withhold |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Charles M. Leighton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Approve Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Approve Executive Incentive Bonus Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Approve Non-Employee Director Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
6 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7
MYLAN LABORATORIES INC.
Ticker: | MYL | Security ID: | 628530107 |
Meeting Date: | JUL 25, 2003 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAY 23, 2003 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Milan Puskar |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Robert J. Coury |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Wendy Cameron |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Laurence S. DeLynn |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director John C. Gaisford, M.D. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Douglas J. Leech |
| For |
| Withhold |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Joseph C. Maroon, M.D. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Patricia A. Sunseri |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director C.B. Todd |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Randall L. Vanderveen, Ph.D. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Stuart A. Williams, Esq. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Increase Authorized Common Stock |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Approve Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
NORTHEAST UTILITIES
Ticker: | NU | Security ID: | 664397106 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 11, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 12, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Richard H. Booth |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Cotton Mather Cleveland |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Sanford Cloud, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director James F. Cordes |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director E. Gail De Planque |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director John H. Forsgren |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director John G. Graham |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Elizabeth T. Kennan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Robert E. Patricelli |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director Charles W. Shivery |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director John F. Swope |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
PLACER DOME INC.
Ticker: | PDG. | Security ID: | 725906101 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 5, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual/Special |
Record Date: | MAR 19, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect G. B. Coulombe as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect J. W. Crow as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect G. Farquharson as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect R. M. Franklin as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect D. S. Karpin as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect R. McFarland as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect C. L. Michel as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect E. A. Parkinson-Marcoux as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect J. K. Taylor as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect V. F. Taylor III as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect W. G. Wilson as a Director |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Ernst & Young LLP as Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Adopt or Amend Shareholder Rights Plan (Poison Pill) |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
8
PRAXAIR, INC.
Ticker: | PX | Security ID: | 74005P104 |
Meeting Date: | APR 27, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 1, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Alejandro Achaval |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Ronald L. Kuehn, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director H. Mitchell Watson, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Increase Authorized Common Stock |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Approve Stockholder Protection Rights Agreement |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
SAFECO CORP.
Ticker: | SAFC | Security ID: | 786429100 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 5, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 8, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Robert S. Cline |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director G. Thompson Hutton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director William W. Krippaehne, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Michael S. McGavick |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
SEMCO ENERGY, INC.
Ticker: | SEN | Security ID: | 78412D109 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 24, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 29, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director John M. Albertine |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director John R. Hinton |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Donald W. Thomason |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Approve Issuance of Warrants/Convertible Debentures |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Increase Authorized Common Stock |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Fix Number of Directors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
5 |
| Approve Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
9
SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Ticker: | SPG | Security ID: | 828806109 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 5, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 8, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Birch Bayh |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Melvyn E. Bergstein |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Linda Walker Bynoe |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Karen N. Horn |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director G. William Miller |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director J. Albert Smith, Jr. |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Pieter S. van den Berg |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Separate Chairman and CEO Positions |
| Against |
| For |
| Shareholder |
|
TRIBUNE CO.
Ticker: | TRB | Security ID: | 896047107 |
Meeting Date: | MAY 12, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 17, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director Jeffrey Chandler |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director William A. Osborn |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Kathryn C. Turner |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Amend Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| Against |
| Management |
|
UNION PACIFIC CORP.
Ticker: | UNP | Security ID: | 907818108 |
Meeting Date: | APR 16, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 6, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director P.F. Anschutz |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director R.K. Davidson |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director T.J. Donohue |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director A.W. Dunham |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director S.F. Eccles |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director I.J. Evans |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director J.R. Hope |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director M.W. Mcconnell |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director S.R. Rogel |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director E. Zedillo |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Approve Omnibus Stock Plan |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
4 |
| Limit Executive Compensation |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Report on Political Contributions/Activities |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
10
VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS
Ticker: | VZ | Security ID: | 92343V104 |
Meeting Date: | APR 28, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | MAR 1, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director James R. Barker |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director Richard L. Carrion |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Robert W. Lane |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Sandra O. Moose |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Joseph Neubauer |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.6 |
| Elect Director Thomas H. O’Brien |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.7 |
| Elect Director Hugh B. Price |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.8 |
| Elect Director Ivan G. Seidenberg |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.9 |
| Elect Director Walter V. Shipley |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.10 |
| Elect Director John R. Stafford |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.11 |
| Elect Director Robert D. Storey |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Restore or Provide for Cumulative Voting |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
4 |
| Require Majority of Independent Directors on Board |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Separate Chairman and CEO Positions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
6 |
| Submit Shareholder Rights Plan (Poison Pill) to Shareholder Vote |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
7 |
| Submit Executive Compensation to Vote |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
8 |
| Prohibit Awards to Executives |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
9 |
| Report on Stock Option Distribution by Race and Gender |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
10 |
| Report on Political Contributions/Activities |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
11 |
| Cease Charitable Contributions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
WACHOVIA CORP.
Ticker: | WB | Security ID: | 929903102 |
Meeting Date: | APR 20, 2004 | Meeting Type: | Annual |
Record Date: | FEB 18, 2004 |
|
|
# |
| Proposal |
| Mgt Rec |
| Vote Cast |
| Sponsor |
|
1.1 |
| Elect Director James S. Balloun |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.2 |
| Elect Director John T. Casteen, III |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.3 |
| Elect Director Joseph Neubauer |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.4 |
| Elect Director Lanty L. Smith |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
1.5 |
| Elect Director Dona Davis Young |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
2 |
| Ratify Auditors |
| For |
| For |
| Management |
|
3 |
| Require Two Candidates for Each Board Seat |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
4 |
| Report on Political Contributions/Activities |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
5 |
| Separate Chairman and CEO Positions |
| Against |
| Against |
| Shareholder |
|
End of Report
11
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Investment Company Act of 1940, the Registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned, thereunto duly authorized.
|
| Lord Abbett Bond-Debenture Fund, Inc. | |||
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
| By: | /s/Christina T. Simmons |
| |
|
|
| Christina T. Simmons |
| |
|
|
| Vice President & Secretary |
| |
|
|
|
|
|
|
Date: August 27, 2004 |
|
|
|
|
|
12